Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1531 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 1531


 AN ACT
 relating to formula funding for excess undergraduate credit hours
 at public institutions of higher education and to the tuition rate
 that may be charged for those credit hours.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.014, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  An institution of higher education may charge a resident
 undergraduate student tuition at a higher rate than the rate
 charged to other resident undergraduate students, not to exceed the
 rate charged to nonresident undergraduate students, if before the
 semester or other academic session begins the student has
 previously attempted a number of semester credit hours for courses
 taken at any institution of higher education while classified as a
 resident student for tuition purposes that exceeds [by at least 30
 hours] the number of semester credit hours required for completion
 of the degree program in which the student is enrolled by at least:
 (1)  for an associate degree program, 15 hours; or
 (2)  for a baccalaureate degree program, 30 hours.
 (a-1)  For purposes of Subsection (a) [this subsection], an
 undergraduate student who is not enrolled in a degree program is
 considered to be enrolled in a baccalaureate degree program [or
 programs requiring a minimum of 120 semester credit hours,
 including minors and double majors, and for completion of any
 certificate or other special program in which the student is also
 enrolled, including a program with a study-abroad component].
 (a-2)  An institution of higher education that charges
 students tuition at a higher rate under Subsection (a) [this
 subsection] may adopt a policy under which the institution exempts
 from the payment of that higher rate a student that is subject to
 the payment of the higher rate solely as a result of hardship as
 determined by the institution under the policy.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 61.0595(a) and (b), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In the formulas established under Section 61.059, the
 board may not include funding for semester credit hours earned by a
 resident undergraduate student who before the semester or other
 academic session begins has previously attempted a number of
 semester credit hours for courses taken at any institution of
 higher education while classified as a resident student for tuition
 purposes that exceeds [by at least 30 hours] the number of semester
 credit hours required for completion of the degree program or
 programs in which the student is enrolled, including minors and
 double majors, and for completion of any certificate or other
 special program in which the student is also enrolled, including a
 program with a study-abroad component, by at least:
 (1)  for an associate degree program, 15 hours; or
 (2)  for a baccalaureate degree program, 30 hours.
 (b)  For purposes of Subsection (a), an undergraduate
 student who is not enrolled in a degree program is considered to be
 enrolled in a baccalaureate degree program [requiring a minimum of
 120 semester credit hours].
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 54.014, Education Code, applies beginning with tuition charged to
 students enrolling for the first time in an associate degree
 program at a public institution of higher education for the 2023
 fall semester.  Tuition charged to a student who first enrolled in
 an associate degree program at a public institution of higher
 education before the 2023 fall semester is governed by the law in
 effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 61.0595, Education Code, applies beginning with funding
 recommendations made under Section 61.059, Education Code, for the
 state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2023, for semester
 credit hours earned by students initially enrolling in an associate
 degree program at a public institution of higher education for the
 2023 fall semester or a subsequent semester or term.  Funding
 recommendations for semester credit hours earned by a student who
 initially enrolled in an associate degree program at a public
 institution of higher education before the 2023 fall semester are
 governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
 of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1531 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1531 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 73,
 Nays 72, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor