Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1541 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021