Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1566 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021