2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 24, 2021, read |
---|
3 | | - | first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; |
---|
4 | | - | April 15, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | | - | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 15, 2021, |
---|
6 | | - | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1566 By: West |
---|
9 | 3 | | |
---|
10 | 4 | | |
---|
11 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 7 | | relating to the continuation of the Trade Agricultural Inspection |
---|
14 | 8 | | Grant Program. |
---|
15 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Sections 12.050(k) and (l), Agriculture Code, |
---|
17 | 11 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 12 | | (k) Not later than January 15, 2025 [2021], the department |
---|
19 | 13 | | shall evaluate the performance of the program under this section |
---|
20 | 14 | | and submit a report to the legislature. The report must include an |
---|
21 | 15 | | evaluation of agricultural inspections affected by the program, |
---|
22 | 16 | | including the extent to which the program is reducing wait times for |
---|
23 | 17 | | agricultural inspections of vehicles at ports of entry along the |
---|
24 | 18 | | border with the United Mexican States. |
---|
25 | 19 | | (l) Unless continued in existence by the legislature, this |
---|
26 | 20 | | section expires September 1, 2025 [2021]. |
---|
27 | | - | SECTION 2. The Department of Agriculture is required to |
---|
28 | | - | implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature |
---|
29 | | - | appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the |
---|
30 | | - | legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that |
---|
31 | | - | purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a |
---|
32 | | - | provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that |
---|
33 | | - | purpose. |
---|
34 | | - | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
| 21 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|