Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB160 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2021

                            S.B. No. 160


 AN ACT
 relating to county road reports.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 251.005 and 251.018, Transportation
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 252.006(e), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  An ex officio road commissioner has the duties of a
 supervisor of public roads as provided by Section [Sections]
 251.004 [and 251.005].
 SECTION 3.  Section 256.104(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In applying for a grant under this subchapter, the
 county shall[:
 [(1)  provide the road condition report described by
 Section 251.018 made by the county for the previous year; and
 [(2)]  submit to the department a plan that:
 (1) [(A)]  provides a list of transportation
 infrastructure projects to be funded by the grant;
 (2) [(B)]  describes the scope of the transportation
 infrastructure project or projects to be funded by the grant using
 best practices for prioritizing the projects;
 (3) [(C)]  provides for matching funds as required by
 Section 256.105; and
 (4) [(D)]  meets any other requirements imposed by the
 department.
 SECTION 4.  Section 256.106(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A county that makes a second or subsequent application
 for a grant from the department under this subchapter must:
 (1)  [provide the department with a copy of a report
 filed under Section 251.018;
 [(2)]  certify that all previous grants are being spent
 in accordance with the plan submitted under Section 256.104; and
 (2) [(3)]  provide an accounting of how previous grants
 were spent, including any amounts spent on administrative costs.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 160 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 160 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 124,
 Nays 19, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor