1 | 1 | | 87R12268 CXP-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Miles S.B. No. 1624 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the governing body of the independent organization |
---|
8 | 8 | | certified to manage the ERCOT power region. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 39.151, Utilities Code, is amended by |
---|
11 | 11 | | amending Subsections (g) and (g-1) and adding Subsection (g-2) to |
---|
12 | 12 | | read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (g) To maintain certification as an independent |
---|
14 | 14 | | organization under this section, an organization's governing body |
---|
15 | 15 | | must be composed of persons specified by this section [and selected |
---|
16 | 16 | | in accordance with formal bylaws or protocols of the organization. |
---|
17 | 17 | | The bylaws or protocols must be approved by the commission and must |
---|
18 | 18 | | reflect the input of the commission. The bylaws must specify the |
---|
19 | 19 | | process by which appropriate stakeholders elect members and, for |
---|
20 | 20 | | unaffiliated members, prescribe professional qualifications for |
---|
21 | 21 | | selection as a member. The bylaws must require the use of a |
---|
22 | 22 | | professional search firm to identify candidates for membership of |
---|
23 | 23 | | unaffiliated members. The process must allow for commission input |
---|
24 | 24 | | in identifying candidates]. The governing body must be composed |
---|
25 | 25 | | of: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (1) the chairman of the commission as an ex officio |
---|
27 | 27 | | nonvoting member; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) eight members appointed by the governor with the |
---|
29 | 29 | | advice and consent of the senate, with: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (A) six members representing various market |
---|
31 | 31 | | segments; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (B) two members representing consumer interests |
---|
33 | 33 | | [the counsellor as an ex officio voting member representing |
---|
34 | 34 | | residential and small commercial consumer interests; |
---|
35 | 35 | | [(3) the chief executive officer of the independent |
---|
36 | 36 | | organization as an ex officio voting member; |
---|
37 | 37 | | [(4) six market participants elected by their |
---|
38 | 38 | | respective market segments to serve one-year terms, with: |
---|
39 | 39 | | [(A) one representing independent generators; |
---|
40 | 40 | | [(B) one representing investor-owned utilities; |
---|
41 | 41 | | [(C) one representing power marketers; |
---|
42 | 42 | | [(D) one representing retail electric providers; |
---|
43 | 43 | | [(E) one representing municipally owned |
---|
44 | 44 | | utilities; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | [(F) one representing electric cooperatives; |
---|
46 | 46 | | [(5) one member representing industrial consumer |
---|
47 | 47 | | interests and elected by the industrial consumer market segment to |
---|
48 | 48 | | serve a one-year term; |
---|
49 | 49 | | [(6) one member representing large commercial |
---|
50 | 50 | | consumer interests selected in accordance with the bylaws to serve |
---|
51 | 51 | | a one-year term; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | [(7) five members unaffiliated with any market segment |
---|
53 | 53 | | and selected by the other members of the governing body to serve |
---|
54 | 54 | | three-year terms]. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (g-1) The governor shall select a presiding officer of the |
---|
56 | 56 | | governing body from among its members [of the governing body must be |
---|
57 | 57 | | one of the members described by Subsection (g)(7)]. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (g-2) Members of the governing body of an independent |
---|
59 | 59 | | organization certified under this section serve staggered terms of |
---|
60 | 60 | | four years, with four members' terms expiring February 1 of each |
---|
61 | 61 | | odd-numbered year. Not later than the 30th day after the date a |
---|
62 | 62 | | member of the governing body's term expires, the governor shall |
---|
63 | 63 | | appoint a replacement in the same manner as the original |
---|
64 | 64 | | appointment. If a vacancy occurs on the governing body, the |
---|
65 | 65 | | governor shall appoint a successor in the same manner as the |
---|
66 | 66 | | original appointment to serve for the remainder of the unexpired |
---|
67 | 67 | | term. The governor shall appoint the successor not later than the |
---|
68 | 68 | | 30th day after the date the vacancy occurs. |
---|
69 | 69 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the |
---|
70 | 70 | | governor shall comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as |
---|
71 | 71 | | amended by this Act, by appointing members to the governing body of |
---|
72 | 72 | | an independent organization certified under Section 39.151, |
---|
73 | 73 | | Utilities Code, by the Public Utility Commission of Texas before |
---|
74 | 74 | | September 1, 2021. To establish staggered terms, the governor |
---|
75 | 75 | | shall designate four initial appointees to serve terms expiring |
---|
76 | 76 | | February 1, 2023, and four initial appointees to serve terms |
---|
77 | 77 | | expiring February 1, 2025. |
---|
78 | 78 | | (b) After September 1, 2022, the Public Utility Commission |
---|
79 | 79 | | of Texas may decertify an independent organization whose governing |
---|
80 | 80 | | body does not comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as |
---|
81 | 81 | | amended by this Act. |
---|
82 | 82 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|