Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1624 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2021

                            87R12268 CXP-D
 By: Miles S.B. No. 1624


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the governing body of the independent organization
 certified to manage the ERCOT power region.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.151, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (g) and (g-1) and adding Subsection (g-2) to
 read as follows:
 (g)  To maintain certification as an independent
 organization under this section, an organization's governing body
 must be composed of persons specified by this section [and selected
 in accordance with formal bylaws or protocols of the organization.
 The bylaws or protocols must be approved by the commission and must
 reflect the input of the commission. The bylaws must specify the
 process by which appropriate stakeholders elect members and, for
 unaffiliated members, prescribe professional qualifications for
 selection as a member. The bylaws must require the use of a
 professional search firm to identify candidates for membership of
 unaffiliated members. The process must allow for commission input
 in identifying candidates]. The governing body must be composed
 of:
 (1)  the chairman of the commission as an ex officio
 nonvoting member; and
 (2)  eight members appointed by the governor with the
 advice and consent of the senate, with:
 (A)  six members representing various market
 segments; and
 (B)  two members representing consumer interests
 [the counsellor as an ex officio voting member representing
 residential and small commercial consumer interests;
 [(3)  the chief executive officer of the independent
 organization as an ex officio voting member;
 [(4)  six market participants elected by their
 respective market segments to serve one-year terms, with:
 [(A)  one representing independent generators;
 [(B)  one representing investor-owned utilities;
 [(C)  one representing power marketers;
 [(D)  one representing retail electric providers;
 [(E)  one representing municipally owned
 utilities; and
 [(F)  one representing electric cooperatives;
 [(5)  one member representing industrial consumer
 interests and elected by the industrial consumer market segment to
 serve a one-year term;
 [(6)  one member representing large commercial
 consumer interests selected in accordance with the bylaws to serve
 a one-year term; and
 [(7)  five members unaffiliated with any market segment
 and selected by the other members of the governing body to serve
 three-year terms].
 (g-1)  The governor shall select a presiding officer of the
 governing body from among its members [of the governing body must be
 one of the members described by Subsection (g)(7)].
 (g-2)  Members of the governing body of an independent
 organization certified under this section serve staggered terms of
 four years, with four members' terms expiring February 1 of each
 odd-numbered year. Not later than the 30th day after the date a
 member of the governing body's term expires, the governor shall
 appoint a replacement in the same manner as the original
 appointment. If a vacancy occurs on the governing body, the
 governor shall appoint a successor in the same manner as the
 original appointment to serve for the remainder of the unexpired
 term. The governor shall appoint the successor not later than the
 30th day after the date the vacancy occurs.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the
 governor shall comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as
 amended by this Act, by appointing members to the governing body of
 an independent organization certified under Section 39.151,
 Utilities Code, by the Public Utility Commission of Texas before
 September 1, 2021. To establish staggered terms, the governor
 shall designate four initial appointees to serve terms expiring
 February 1, 2023, and four initial appointees to serve terms
 expiring February 1, 2025.
 (b)  After September 1, 2022, the Public Utility Commission
 of Texas may decertify an independent organization whose governing
 body does not comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.