Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1643 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021