House | 05/03/2021 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Amendment fails of adoption | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |