Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1646 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Perry, et al. S.B. No. 1646
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
4+ April 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 2; April 20, 2021,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1646 By: Birdwell
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to the definition of abuse of a child.
714 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
815 SECTION 1. Section 261.001, Family Code, is amended by
916 amending Subdivision (1) and adding Subdivision (3-a) to read as
1017 follows:
1118 (1) "Abuse":
1219 (A) includes the following acts or omissions by a
1320 person:
1421 (i) [(A)] mental or emotional injury to a
1522 child that results in an observable and material impairment in the
1623 child's growth, development, or psychological functioning;
1724 (ii) [(B)] causing or permitting the child
1825 to be in a situation in which the child sustains a mental or
1926 emotional injury that results in an observable and material
2027 impairment in the child's growth, development, or psychological
2128 functioning;
2229 (iii) [(C)] physical injury that results in
2330 substantial harm to the child, or the genuine threat of substantial
2431 harm from physical injury to the child, including an injury that is
2532 at variance with the history or explanation given and excluding an
2633 accident or reasonable discipline by a parent, guardian, or
2734 managing or possessory conservator that does not expose the child
2835 to a substantial risk of harm;
2936 (iv) [(D)] failure to make a reasonable
3037 effort to prevent an action by another person that results in
3138 physical injury that results in substantial harm to the child;
3239 (v) [(E)] sexual conduct harmful to a
3340 child's mental, emotional, or physical welfare, including conduct
3441 that constitutes the offense of continuous sexual abuse of young
3542 child or children under Section 21.02, Penal Code, indecency with a
3643 child under Section 21.11, Penal Code, sexual assault under Section
3744 22.011, Penal Code, or aggravated sexual assault under Section
3845 22.021, Penal Code;
3946 (vi) [(F)] failure to make a reasonable
4047 effort to prevent sexual conduct harmful to a child;
4148 (vii) [(G)] compelling or encouraging the
4249 child to engage in sexual conduct as defined by Section 43.01, Penal
4350 Code, including compelling or encouraging the child in a manner
4451 that constitutes an offense of trafficking of persons under Section
4552 20A.02(a)(7) or (8), Penal Code, prostitution under Section
4653 43.02(b), Penal Code, or compelling prostitution under Section
4754 43.05(a)(2), Penal Code;
4855 (viii) [(H)] causing, permitting,
4956 encouraging, engaging in, or allowing the photographing, filming,
5057 or depicting of the child if the person knew or should have known
5158 that the resulting photograph, film, or depiction of the child is
5259 obscene as defined by Section 43.21, Penal Code, or pornographic;
5360 (ix) [(I)] the current use by a person of a
5461 controlled substance as defined by Chapter 481, Health and Safety
5562 Code, in a manner or to the extent that the use results in physical,
5663 mental, or emotional injury to a child;
5764 (x) [(J)] causing, expressly permitting,
5865 or encouraging a child to use a controlled substance as defined by
5966 Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code;
6067 (xi) [(K)] causing, permitting,
6168 encouraging, engaging in, or allowing a sexual performance by a
6269 child as defined by Section 43.25, Penal Code;
6370 (xii) [(L)] knowingly causing, permitting,
6471 encouraging, engaging in, or allowing a child to be trafficked in a
6572 manner punishable as an offense under Section 20A.02(a)(5), (6),
6673 (7), or (8), Penal Code, or the failure to make a reasonable effort
6774 to prevent a child from being trafficked in a manner punishable as
6875 an offense under any of those sections; [or]
6976 (xiii) [(M)] forcing or coercing a child to
7077 enter into a marriage;
7178 (xiv) administering or supplying, or
7279 consenting to or assisting in the administration or supply of, a
7380 puberty suppression prescription drug or cross-sex hormone to a
7481 child, other than an intersex child, for the purpose of gender
7582 transitioning or gender reassignment; or
7683 (xv) performing or consenting to the
7784 performance of surgery or another medical procedure on a child,
7885 other than an intersex child, for the purpose of gender
7986 transitioning or gender reassignment; and
8087 (B) does not include an act described by
8188 Subparagraph (xiv) if the act is the dispensing or delivery of a
8289 drug in accordance with Subtitle J, Title 3, Occupations Code, by a
8390 person licensed under that subtitle.
8491 (3-a) "Intersex child" means a child who is younger
8592 than 18 years of age and either:
8693 (A) has inborn chromosomal, gonadal, genital, or
8794 endocrine characteristics, or a combination of those
8895 characteristics, that are not suited to the typical definition of
8996 male or female or are atypical for the determined sex of the child;
9097 or
9198 (B) is considered by a medical professional to
9299 have inborn chromosomal, gonadal, genital, or endocrine
93100 characteristics that are ambiguous or atypical for the determined
94101 sex of the child.
95102 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
96103 261.001, Family Code, do not apply to a person alleged to have
97104 committed abuse with respect to a child who:
98105 (1) was born on or before August 31, 2010; and
99106 (2) before the effective date of this Act, under the
100107 care of a licensed physician began taking puberty suppressant
101108 prescription drugs or cross-sex hormones or had any surgery or
102109 medical procedure performed for the purpose of gender transitioning
103110 or gender reassignment.
104111 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
112+ * * * * *