Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1648 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 30, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 30, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021