8 | | - | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | | - | amended by adding Section 531.024165 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | | - | Sec. 531.024165. MEDICAL REVIEW OF MEDICAID SERVICE DENIALS |
---|
11 | | - | FOR FOSTER CARE YOUTH. (a) Using existing resources, the |
---|
12 | | - | commission shall coordinate with the Department of Family and |
---|
13 | | - | Protective Services to develop and implement a process to review a |
---|
14 | | - | denial of services under the Medicaid managed care program on the |
---|
15 | | - | basis of medical necessity for foster care youth. |
---|
16 | | - | (b) Not later than December 31, 2022, the commission and the |
---|
17 | | - | Department of Family and Protective Services shall submit a report |
---|
18 | | - | to the legislature that includes a summary of the process developed |
---|
19 | | - | and implemented under Subsection (a). |
---|
20 | | - | (c) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
21 | | - | SECTION 2. Section 531.024172(d), Government Code, is |
---|
22 | | - | amended to read as follows: |
---|
23 | | - | (d) In implementing the electronic visit verification |
---|
24 | | - | system: |
---|
25 | | - | (1) subject to Subsection (e), the executive |
---|
26 | | - | commissioner shall adopt compliance standards for health care |
---|
27 | | - | providers; and |
---|
28 | | - | (2) the commission shall ensure that: |
---|
29 | | - | (A) the information required to be reported by |
---|
30 | | - | health care providers is standardized across managed care |
---|
31 | | - | organizations that contract with the commission to provide health |
---|
32 | | - | care services to Medicaid recipients and across commission |
---|
33 | | - | programs; |
---|
34 | | - | (B) processes required by managed care |
---|
35 | | - | organizations to retrospectively correct data are standardized and |
---|
36 | | - | publicly accessible to health care providers; [and] |
---|
37 | | - | (C) standardized processes are established for |
---|
38 | | - | addressing the failure of a managed care organization to provide a |
---|
39 | | - | timely authorization for delivering services necessary to ensure |
---|
40 | | - | continuity of care; and |
---|
41 | | - | (D) a health care provider is allowed to enter a |
---|
42 | | - | variable schedule into the electronic visit verification system. |
---|
43 | | - | SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
44 | | - | amended by adding Sections 531.0501, 531.0512, and 531.0605 to read |
---|
45 | | - | as follows: |
---|
46 | | - | Sec. 531.0501. MEDICAID WAIVER PROGRAMS: INTEREST LIST |
---|
47 | | - | MANAGEMENT. (a) The commission, in consultation with the |
---|
48 | | - | Intellectual and Developmental Disability System Redesign Advisory |
---|
49 | | - | Committee established under Section 534.053 and the STAR Kids |
---|
50 | | - | Managed Care Advisory Committee, shall study the feasibility of |
---|
51 | | - | creating an online portal for individuals to request to be placed |
---|
52 | | - | and check the individual's placement on a Medicaid waiver program |
---|
53 | | - | interest list. As part of the study, the commission shall determine |
---|
54 | | - | the most appropriate and cost-effective automated method for |
---|
55 | | - | determining the level of need of an individual seeking services |
---|
56 | | - | through a Medicaid waiver program. |
---|
57 | | - | (b) Not later than January 1, 2023, the commission shall |
---|
58 | | - | prepare and submit a report to the governor, the lieutenant |
---|
59 | | - | governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the |
---|
60 | | - | standing legislative committees with primary jurisdiction over |
---|
61 | | - | health and human services that summarizes the commission's findings |
---|
62 | | - | and conclusions from the study. |
---|
63 | | - | (c) Subsections (a) and (b) and this subsection expire |
---|
64 | | - | September 1, 2023. |
---|
65 | | - | (d) The commission shall develop a protocol in the office of |
---|
66 | | - | the ombudsman to improve the capture and updating of contact |
---|
67 | | - | information for an individual who contacts the office of the |
---|
68 | | - | ombudsman regarding Medicaid waiver programs or services. |
---|
69 | | - | Sec. 531.0512. NOTIFICATION REGARDING CONSUMER DIRECTION |
---|
70 | | - | MODEL. The commission shall: |
---|
71 | | - | (1) develop a procedure to: |
---|
72 | | - | (A) verify that a Medicaid recipient or the |
---|
73 | | - | recipient's parent or legal guardian is informed regarding the |
---|
74 | | - | consumer direction model and provided the option to choose to |
---|
75 | | - | receive care under that model; and |
---|
76 | | - | (B) if the individual declines to receive care |
---|
77 | | - | under the consumer direction model, document the declination; and |
---|
78 | | - | (2) ensure that each Medicaid managed care |
---|
79 | | - | organization implements the procedure. |
---|
80 | | - | Sec. 531.0605. ADVANCING CARE FOR EXCEPTIONAL KIDS PILOT |
---|
81 | | - | PROGRAM. (a) The commission shall collaborate with the STAR Kids |
---|
82 | | - | Managed Care Advisory Committee, Medicaid recipients, family |
---|
83 | | - | members of children with complex medical conditions, children's |
---|
84 | | - | health care advocates, Medicaid managed care organizations, and |
---|
85 | | - | other stakeholders to develop and implement a pilot program that is |
---|
86 | | - | substantially similar to the program described by Section 3, |
---|
87 | | - | Medicaid Services Investment and Accountability Act of 2019 (Pub. |
---|
88 | | - | L. No. 116-16), to provide coordinated care through a health home |
---|
89 | | - | to children with complex medical conditions. |
---|
90 | | - | (b) The commission shall seek guidance from the Centers for |
---|
91 | | - | Medicare and Medicaid Services and the United States Department of |
---|
92 | | - | Health and Human Services regarding the design of the program and, |
---|
93 | | - | based on the guidance, may actively seek and apply for federal |
---|
94 | | - | funding to implement the program. |
---|
95 | | - | (c) Not later than December 31, 2024, the commission shall |
---|
96 | | - | prepare and submit a report to the legislature that includes: |
---|
97 | | - | (1) a summary of the commission's implementation of |
---|
98 | | - | the pilot program; and |
---|
99 | | - | (2) if the pilot program has been operating for a |
---|
100 | | - | period sufficient to obtain necessary data, a summary of the |
---|
101 | | - | commission's evaluation of the effect of the pilot program on the |
---|
102 | | - | coordination of care for children with complex medical conditions |
---|
103 | | - | and a recommendation as to whether the pilot program should be |
---|
104 | | - | continued, expanded, or terminated. |
---|
105 | | - | (d) The pilot program terminates and this section expires |
---|
106 | | - | September 1, 2025. |
---|
107 | | - | SECTION 4. The heading to Section 533.038, Government Code, |
---|
| 10 | + | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 533.038, Government Code, |
---|
165 | | - | SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
166 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
167 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
168 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1648 passed the Senate on |
---|
169 | | - | May 12, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; |
---|
170 | | - | May 27, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
171 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House |
---|
172 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted |
---|
173 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
174 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
175 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
176 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
177 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1648 passed the House, with |
---|
178 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 141, |
---|
179 | | - | Nays 1, one present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request |
---|
180 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
181 | | - | May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
182 | | - | following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
183 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
184 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
185 | | - | Approved: |
---|
186 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
187 | | - | Date |
---|
188 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
189 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 53 | + | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|