Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1668 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021