Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1675 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2021

                    By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 1675
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 15, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 15, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1675 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to procedures for early voting by mail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 81, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Section 81.006 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.006.  MODIFICATION OF EARLY VOTING BY MAIL
 QUALIFICATIONS AND PROCEDURES. Except as specifically permitted by
 statute, the qualifications for early voting by mail and procedures
 for conducting early voting by mail may not be amended or suspended
 for any reason.
 SECTION 2.  Section 418.016, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a) and except as provided
 by this subsection, the governor may not suspend a provision of a
 statute, an order, or a rule under this section if the provision,
 order, or rule is related to the qualifications or procedures for
 early voting by mail. Upon declaration of a state of disaster, the
 governor may suspend Section 86.006(a-1), Election Code, only for
 the purpose of allowing a voter registered to vote at an address
 located in a disaster area to deliver a marked ballot voted under
 Section 86.006(a-1) to the early voting clerk's office on or before
 election day.
 SECTION 3.  Section 418.108, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  The presiding officer of the governing body of a
 political subdivision may not suspend a provision of a statute,
 rule, or order under this section if the statute, rule, or order is
 related to the qualifications or procedures for early voting by
 mail.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *