Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1675 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021