Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1692 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2021

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 1692
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of home dialysis care by a dialysis
 technician.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 251, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 251.033 to read as follows:
 Sec. 251.033.  PROVISION OF HOME DIALYSIS CARE. (a) A
 dialysis technician may provide home dialysis care, including
 hemodialysis, only if:
 (1)  the care is provided under the direct supervision
 of a registered nurse who is employed by the same entity that
 employs the dialysis technician; and
 (2)  the dialysis technician has:
 (A)  complied with all executive commissioner
 rules on training and competency for dialysis technicians; and
 (B)  successfully completed orientation and
 skills education requirements equivalent to the requirements for a
 registered or licensed vocational nurse who provides home dialysis
 care.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, "direct supervision"
 means supervision by a registered nurse who is physically present
 on the premises, but not necessarily present in the room where the
 dialysis services are provided, at which a dialysis technician
 provides home dialysis care and is immediately available to respond
 to patient needs.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 Section 251.033, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *