Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1692 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021