Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1692 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 1692


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of home dialysis care by a dialysis
 technician.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 251, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 251.033 to read as follows:
 Sec. 251.033.  PROVISION OF HOME DIALYSIS CARE IN NURSING
 FACILITIES. (a) A dialysis technician may provide home dialysis
 care in a nursing facility, including hemodialysis, only if:
 (1)  the care is provided under the personal
 supervision of a registered nurse who is:
 (A)  in compliance with all commission rules under
 26 T.A.C. Section 558.405 regarding training and competency for
 registered nurses to provide care at end stage renal disease
 facilities; and
 (B)  employed by the same entity that employs the
 dialysis technician; and
 (2)  the dialysis technician has complied with all
 commission rules regarding training and competency for dialysis
 technicians.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, "personal supervision"
 means supervision of a dialysis technician by a registered nurse
 who is physically present in the room during the administration of
 dialysis services by the dialysis technician.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 Section 251.033, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1692 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1692 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 109,
 Nays 34, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor