Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1696 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021