Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1696 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 1696


 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a system for the sharing of information
 regarding cyber attacks or other cybersecurity incidents occurring
 in schools in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 11.175, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.175.  SCHOOL [DISTRICT] CYBERSECURITY.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.175, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsections (g), (h), and (i) to
 read as follows:
 (e)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school
 [The district's cybersecurity coordinator] shall report to the
 agency or, if applicable, the entity that administers the system
 established under Subsection (g) any cyber attack or other
 cybersecurity incident against the school district's or
 open-enrollment charter school's [district] cyberinfrastructure
 that constitutes a breach of system security as soon as practicable
 after the discovery of the attack or incident.
 (g)  The agency, in coordination with the Department of
 Information Resources, shall establish and maintain a system to
 coordinate the anonymous sharing of information concerning cyber
 attacks or other cybersecurity incidents between participating
 schools and the state.  The system must:
 (1)  include each report made under Subsection (e);
 (2)  provide for reports made under Subsection (e) to
 be shared between participating schools in as close to real time as
 possible; and
 (3)  preserve a reporting school's anonymity by
 preventing the disclosure through the system of the name of the
 school at which an attack or incident occurred.
 (h)  In establishing the system under Subsection (g), the
 agency may contract with a qualified third party to administer the
 system.
 (i)  The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1696 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1696 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor