Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1701 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021