Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1704 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021