Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1704 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 1704


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the portion of United States Highway
 54 in El Paso County as the Korean War Veterans Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.190 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.190.  KOREAN WAR VETERANS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)
 The portion of United States Highway 54 in El Paso County between
 its intersection with State Highway Loop 375 and the New Mexico
 state border is designated as the Korean War Veterans Memorial
 Highway.  This designation is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Korean War Veterans Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1704 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 28, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1704 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 143,
 Nays 4, two present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor