House | 05/24/2021 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Amended | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Referred to Jurisprudence | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Rereferred to committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |