Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1741 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2021