House | 05/21/2021 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Referred to Urban Affairs | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |