Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1744 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2021