LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2021 - 87th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1750
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1750
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1750
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 12, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 26, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 19, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note
April 5, 2021
Analysis
Analysis
April 16, 2021
Analysis
April 5, 2021