Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1761 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021