Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1772 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 1772


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Texas Pollinator-Smart program
 for solar energy sites.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter K, Chapter 88,
 Education Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER K. TEXAS A&M AGRILIFE EXTENSION [SERVICE]
 SECTION 2.  Section 88.821, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 88.821.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "AgriLife
 Extension" or "extension service" means [the] Texas A&M AgriLife
 Extension [Service].
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter K, Chapter 88, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 88.824 to read as follows:
 Sec. 88.824.  TEXAS POLLINATOR-SMART PROGRAM. (a) AgriLife
 Extension, in consultation with the Department of Agriculture and
 the Parks and Wildlife Department, shall establish and implement
 the Texas Pollinator-Smart program to encourage the voluntary
 establishment and conservation of habitats for bees, birds, and
 other pollinators in and near solar energy sites.
 (b)  AgriLife Extension, in consultation with the Department
 of Agriculture and the Parks and Wildlife Department, shall develop
 educational materials for the program that include information
 regarding:
 (1)  benefits to solar energy producers, neighboring
 landowners, agricultural producers, and the environment of
 providing pollinator habitats at solar energy sites;
 (2)  resources and practices for establishing and
 maintaining pollinator habitats;
 (3)  native plant species compatible with solar energy
 sites that provide habitat for pollinators;
 (4)  methods to prevent, identify, and eradicate
 invasive species without causing harm to pollinators;
 (5)  any available grants or other financial incentives
 for establishing or maintaining pollinator habitats;
 (6)  examples of pollinator habitats established at
 solar energy sites in this state or other locations; and
 (7)  the Texas Pollinator-Smart certificate under
 Subsection (c).
 (c)  AgriLife Extension shall, in consultation with the
 Department of Agriculture and the Parks and Wildlife Department,
 award the Texas Pollinator-Smart certificate to solar energy sites
 with pollinator habitats that meet or achieve a standard determined
 by AgriLife Extension.
 (d)  AgriLife Extension may provide advice and technical
 assistance to participants and potential participants in the Texas
 Pollinator-Smart program, including reports evaluating the
 suitability of solar energy sites.
 (e)  Participation in the Texas Pollinator-Smart program by
 a solar energy site is voluntary.
 SECTION 4.  Texas A&M AgriLife Extension is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, Texas A&M AgriLife Extension may, but is not required to,
 implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
 available for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1772 passed the Senate on
 May 3, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1772 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 109,
 Nays 38, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor