Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1772 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021