Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1792 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/30/2021

                            By: West S.B. No. 1792
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 30, 2021,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3, one
 present not voting; April 30, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a leave pool for school district employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.003, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) and amending Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a-1)  In addition to all other days of leave provided by
 this section or by the school district, a school district shall
 provide one day of personal leave per district employee in a leave
 pool established by the district board of trustees in accordance
 with this subsection and Subsection (a-2). The district shall
 allow an employee to voluntarily contribute to the leave pool
 created under this subsection one or more additional days of
 personal leave accumulated by the employee.  The district shall
 credit the leave pool with the number of days of personal leave
 contributed by the employee and deduct a corresponding number of
 days of leave from the employee's accrued personal leave as if the
 employee had taken the leave.
 (a-2)  In establishing a leave pool under Subsection (a-1),
 the board of trustees of a school district shall adopt procedures
 for the administration and operation of the leave pool.  The
 procedures must ensure that the number of days of personal leave
 that an employee is permitted to use from the leave pool is related
 to the number of personal days of leave contributed by the employee
 under Subsection (a-1).
 (c-1)  Any informational handbook a school district provides
 to employees in an electronic or paper form or makes available by
 posting on the district website must include information on the
 leave pool created under Subsection (a-1) and notification of an
 employee's rights under Subsection (b) in the relevant section of
 the handbook.  Any form used by a school district through which an
 employee may request leave under this section must include assault
 leave under Subsection (b) as an option.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *