Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB18 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 9, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021