Senate | 05/03/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/30/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 11/12/2020 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2020 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |