Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1809 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 5, 2021