Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1817 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2021

                            S.B. No. 1817


 AN ACT
 relating to vehicle titles and registration.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2303.154, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  A vehicle sold in compliance with this chapter shall be
 titled and registered without the imposition by a county office of
 additional requirements not otherwise permitted by law.
 SECTION 2.  Section 501.051, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The department shall place a hold on processing a title
 application for a motor vehicle if the department receives a
 request for a hold accompanied by evidence of a legal action
 regarding ownership of or a lien interest in the motor vehicle. The
 hold shall continue until a final, nonappealable judgment is
 entered in the action or the party requesting the hold requests that
 the hold be removed.
 SECTION 3.  Section 501.052, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  An applicant aggrieved by the determination under
 Subsection (d) may appeal only to the county or district court of
 the county of the applicant's residence.  An applicant must file an
 appeal not later than the fifth day after receipt [the date] of the
 assessor-collector's determination.  The judge shall try the
 appeal in the manner of other civil cases.  All rights and
 immunities granted in the trial of a civil case are available to the
 interested parties.  If the department's action is not sustained,
 the department shall promptly issue a title for the vehicle.
 (f)  A person may not apply for a hearing under this section
 if the department's decision under Section 501.051 is related to a
 title for a salvage motor vehicle or a nonrepairable motor vehicle,
 as defined by Section 501.091.
 SECTION 4.  Section 501.053, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  A person may not obtain a title under this section for a
 salvage motor vehicle or a nonrepairable motor vehicle, as defined
 by Section 501.091.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1817 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1817 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 8, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor