Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB183 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021