Senate | 05/05/2021 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |