Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1838 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021