Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1856 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 1856


 AN ACT
 relating to certain vocational nursing students providing services
 during a declared state of disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 242, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter T to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER T.  SERVICES PROVIDED BY CERTAIN VOCATIONAL NURSING
 STUDENTS
 Sec. 242.951.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "disaster"
 has the meaning assigned by Section 418.004, Government Code.
 Sec. 242.952.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies only
 to a student who is:
 (1)  enrolled in an accredited school or program that
 is preparing the student for licensure as a licensed vocational
 nurse; and
 (2)  participating in a clinical program at a facility
 licensed under this chapter.
 Sec. 242.953.  SERVICES PROVIDED BY CERTAIN VOCATIONAL
 NURSING STUDENTS. (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, services
 that are provided by a student to whom this subchapter applies in a
 facility licensed under this chapter and authorized by a contract
 or other arrangement with the facility are allowed at all times in
 this state, including during a declared state of disaster.
 (b)  A facility licensed under this chapter may:
 (1)  require a student to comply with the facility's
 policies regarding health screenings or the use of personal
 protective equipment; and
 (2)  condition the student's provision of services on
 compliance with the facility's policies described by Subdivision
 (1).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1856 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1856 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor