1 | 1 | | 87R8204 KKR-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Powell S.B. No. 1858 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to a study and pilot program to evaluate the provision of |
---|
8 | 8 | | prenatal and well child care in a group clinical setting and |
---|
9 | 9 | | authority to take related action. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
12 | 12 | | amended by adding Section 531.02493 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 531.02493. CURRICULUM-BASED GROUP WELL CHILD CARE |
---|
14 | 14 | | PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The commission shall develop and, not later |
---|
15 | 15 | | than March 1, 2022, implement a pilot program to increase the rate |
---|
16 | 16 | | at which recipients attend well child health care visits, |
---|
17 | 17 | | developmental screenings, and immunizations by providing those |
---|
18 | 18 | | services through a curriculum-based group well child care model in |
---|
19 | 19 | | a clinical setting. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (b) The commission shall operate the pilot program in one or |
---|
21 | 21 | | more geographic areas of this state. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (c) In implementing the pilot program, the commission |
---|
23 | 23 | | shall: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) require a Medicaid managed care organization to |
---|
25 | 25 | | provide enhanced reimbursement in an amount determined by the |
---|
26 | 26 | | commission to a health care provider for providing curriculum-based |
---|
27 | 27 | | group well child care to recipients; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) evaluate whether the enhanced reimbursement |
---|
29 | 29 | | increases the rate of children receiving well child visits, |
---|
30 | 30 | | developmental screenings, and immunizations. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (d) The commission shall operate the pilot program for two |
---|
32 | 32 | | years. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (e) Not later than September 1, 2024, the commission shall |
---|
34 | 34 | | submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the |
---|
35 | 35 | | house of representatives, and each standing committee of the |
---|
36 | 36 | | legislature having primary jurisdiction over health and human |
---|
37 | 37 | | services a written report that: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) summarizes the results of the pilot program; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | (2) recommends whether the pilot program should |
---|
40 | 40 | | continue, be expanded, or terminate or if the commission should |
---|
41 | 41 | | permanently implement enhanced reimbursement to health care |
---|
42 | 42 | | providers for providing curriculum-based group well child care in a |
---|
43 | 43 | | clinical setting. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (f) The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary |
---|
45 | 45 | | to implement this section. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (g) This section expires September 1, 2025. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 2. (a) In this section: |
---|
48 | 48 | | (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services |
---|
49 | 49 | | Commission. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (2) "Medicaid" means the medical assistance program |
---|
51 | 51 | | established under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (3) "Medicaid managed care organization" means a |
---|
53 | 53 | | managed care organization as defined by Section 533.001, Government |
---|
54 | 54 | | Code, that contracts with the commission under Chapter 533, |
---|
55 | 55 | | Government Code, to provide health care services to Medicaid |
---|
56 | 56 | | recipients. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (b) The commission shall conduct a study regarding the |
---|
58 | 58 | | provision of curriculum-based prenatal care and curriculum-based |
---|
59 | 59 | | well child care offered in a group clinical setting. The study |
---|
60 | 60 | | must: |
---|
61 | 61 | | (1) evaluate the health benefits and potential cost |
---|
62 | 62 | | savings to Medicaid that would result from implementing |
---|
63 | 63 | | curriculum-based group prenatal care models, including |
---|
64 | 64 | | implementation of those models using virtual modalities similar to |
---|
65 | 65 | | those used during the COVID-19 pandemic; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (2) evaluate the use of procedure codes under Medicaid |
---|
67 | 67 | | for curriculum-based group prenatal care in a clinical setting; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (3) reassess the provider types authorized to provide |
---|
69 | 69 | | prenatal benefits in a group clinical setting under Medicaid by |
---|
70 | 70 | | identifying provider types that deliver curriculum-based group |
---|
71 | 71 | | prenatal care, including federally qualified health centers, |
---|
72 | 72 | | hospitals, rural health clinics, and individual health care |
---|
73 | 73 | | providers; and |
---|
74 | 74 | | (4) explore options for promoting curriculum-based |
---|
75 | 75 | | group well child care models under Medicaid, including by: |
---|
76 | 76 | | (A) assessing the need for establishing a |
---|
77 | 77 | | procedure code under Medicaid for the provision of curriculum-based |
---|
78 | 78 | | group well child care in a clinical setting; and |
---|
79 | 79 | | (B) promoting value-based payment arrangements |
---|
80 | 80 | | between providers and Medicaid managed care organizations. |
---|
81 | 81 | | (c) Not later than September 1, 2022, the commission shall: |
---|
82 | 82 | | (1) prepare and submit a report on the findings of the |
---|
83 | 83 | | study conducted under Subsection (b) of this section to the |
---|
84 | 84 | | standing committees of the senate and house of representatives |
---|
85 | 85 | | having jurisdiction over Medicaid; and |
---|
86 | 86 | | (2) based on the assessment under Subsection (b)(3) of |
---|
87 | 87 | | this section, update the health care provider types that may |
---|
88 | 88 | | provide prenatal benefits in a group clinical setting under |
---|
89 | 89 | | Medicaid. |
---|
90 | 90 | | (d) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
91 | 91 | | SECTION 3. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
92 | 92 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
93 | 93 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
94 | 94 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
95 | 95 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
96 | 96 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
97 | 97 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|