Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1858 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2021

                            87R8204 KKR-D
 By: Powell S.B. No. 1858


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and pilot program to evaluate the provision of
 prenatal and well child care in a group clinical setting and
 authority to take related action.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02493 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02493.  CURRICULUM-BASED GROUP WELL CHILD CARE
 PILOT PROGRAM.  (a)  The commission shall develop and, not later
 than March 1, 2022, implement a pilot program to increase the rate
 at which recipients attend well child health care visits,
 developmental screenings, and immunizations by providing those
 services through a curriculum-based group well child care model in
 a clinical setting.
 (b)  The commission shall operate the pilot program in one or
 more geographic areas of this state.
 (c)  In implementing the pilot program, the commission
 shall:
 (1)  require a Medicaid managed care organization to
 provide enhanced reimbursement in an amount determined by the
 commission to a health care provider for providing curriculum-based
 group well child care to recipients; and
 (2)  evaluate whether the enhanced reimbursement
 increases the rate of children receiving well child visits,
 developmental screenings, and immunizations.
 (d)  The commission shall operate the pilot program for two
 years.
 (e)  Not later than September 1, 2024, the commission shall
 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and each standing committee of the
 legislature having primary jurisdiction over health and human
 services a written report that:
 (1)  summarizes the results of the pilot program; and
 (2)  recommends whether the pilot program should
 continue, be expanded, or terminate or if the commission should
 permanently implement enhanced reimbursement to health care
 providers for providing curriculum-based group well child care in a
 clinical setting.
 (f)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary
 to implement this section.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 (2)  "Medicaid" means the medical assistance program
 established under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code.
 (3)  "Medicaid managed care organization" means a
 managed care organization as defined by Section 533.001, Government
 Code, that contracts with the commission under Chapter 533,
 Government Code, to provide health care services to Medicaid
 recipients.
 (b)  The commission shall conduct a study regarding the
 provision of curriculum-based prenatal care and curriculum-based
 well child care offered in a group clinical setting. The study
 must:
 (1)  evaluate the health benefits and potential cost
 savings to Medicaid that would result from implementing
 curriculum-based group prenatal care models, including
 implementation of those models using virtual modalities similar to
 those used during the COVID-19 pandemic;
 (2)  evaluate the use of procedure codes under Medicaid
 for curriculum-based group prenatal care in a clinical setting;
 (3)  reassess the provider types authorized to provide
 prenatal benefits in a group clinical setting under Medicaid by
 identifying provider types that deliver curriculum-based group
 prenatal care, including federally qualified health centers,
 hospitals, rural health clinics, and individual health care
 providers; and
 (4)  explore options for promoting curriculum-based
 group well child care models under Medicaid, including by:
 (A)  assessing the need for establishing a
 procedure code under Medicaid for the provision of curriculum-based
 group well child care in a clinical setting; and
 (B)  promoting value-based payment arrangements
 between providers and Medicaid managed care organizations.
 (c)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the commission shall:
 (1)  prepare and submit a report on the findings of the
 study conducted under Subsection (b) of this section to the
 standing committees of the senate and house of representatives
 having jurisdiction over Medicaid; and
 (2)  based on the assessment under Subsection (b)(3) of
 this section, update the health care provider types that may
 provide prenatal benefits in a group clinical setting under
 Medicaid.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.