House | 05/25/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 West | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |