Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1865 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021