Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1900 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 8, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021