Senate | 04/29/2021 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |