Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1910 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/22/2021

                            By: Blanco S.B. No. 1910
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; April 1, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation
 to provide road services on federal military property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.1056 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.1056.  AGREEMENTS FOR SERVICES ON FEDERAL MILITARY
 PROPERTY. (a)  The department may enter into an agreement with the
 United States Department of Defense or another federal entity to
 allow the department to assist with the provision of road
 maintenance, improvement, relocation, or extension services for
 military installations.
 (b)  State funds may not be used to provide services under an
 agreement entered into under this section.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the department may not
 enter into an agreement under this section if payment for the
 services provided under the agreement would be made from funds
 provided to the state for public roads under Title 23, United States
 Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *