Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2012 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 9, 2021