Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 18, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021