Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021